Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1658 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1658
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1658 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report on the establishment of a franchise
 tax credit for the development of low income housing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  In this Act, "department" means the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 (b)  The department shall conduct a study to evaluate the
 feasibility, methods, and costs of establishing a franchise tax
 credit for the development of low income housing.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the department shall:
 (1)  evaluate and identify any sources of funding that
 might be available to cover the probable cost of the credit;
 (2)  evaluate methods that have been implemented by
 other states to provide a similar tax credit for the development of
 low income housing and identify the method or methods that have
 resulted in the greatest increase in the number of affordable
 housing units;
 (3)  consider potential credit amounts and estimate:
 (A)  the number of affordable housing units that
 would result from each credit amount; and
 (B)  the probable cost of each credit amount;
 (4)  estimate any tax savings to businesses that would
 result if the credit could be sold or exchanged; and
 (5)  identify the state agency or agencies that could
 most efficiently implement and administer the credit.
 (d)  The comptroller of public accounts shall assist the
 department in conducting the study at the department's request.
 (e)  Not later than September 1, 2016, the department shall
 submit to the legislature a written report on the results of the
 study and any recommendations for legislative or other action.
 (f)  This Act expires September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *