House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2830 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1430 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1383 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1383 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1383 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1383 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Seliger | Journal Page: 1382 |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1382 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1382 | |
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1249 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |