Senate | 04/30/2015 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1215 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |