Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1704 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 1704
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 23, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the transfer of certain inmates to the Texas Department
 of Criminal Justice following pronouncement of the inmate's
 sentence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 3, Article 42.09, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 3.  If a defendant [is] convicted of a felony is [and]
 sentenced to death or to[,] life[, or a term of more than ten years]
 in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice or is ineligible for
 release on bail pending appeal under Article 44.04(b) and [he]
 gives notice of appeal, the defendant [he] shall be transferred to
 the department on a commitment pending a mandate from the court of
 appeals or the Court of Criminal Appeals.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *