Senate | 04/29/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1092 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 545 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |