1 | 1 | | By: Huffman S.B. No. 1706 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 23, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 14, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a grant program to fund domestic violence high risk |
---|
12 | 12 | | teams. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 402, Government Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 402.038 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 402.038. DOMESTIC VIOLENCE HIGH RISK TEAMS GRANT |
---|
17 | 17 | | PROGRAM. (a) A domestic violence high risk team is a |
---|
18 | 18 | | multidisciplinary team that coordinates efforts to increase the |
---|
19 | 19 | | safety of victims of family violence, as that term is defined by |
---|
20 | 20 | | Section 71.004, Family Code, by monitoring and containing |
---|
21 | 21 | | perpetrators while providing victim services. The team may be |
---|
22 | 22 | | composed of law enforcement officers, prosecutors, community |
---|
23 | 23 | | supervision and corrections departments, victim advocates, |
---|
24 | 24 | | nonprofit organizations that provide services or shelter to victims |
---|
25 | 25 | | of family violence, and medical personnel. The team members work |
---|
26 | 26 | | together to share information and communicate to provide the best |
---|
27 | 27 | | possible responses to victims at high risk. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) Using money appropriated for the purpose, the attorney |
---|
29 | 29 | | general may award grants to domestic violence high risk teams in |
---|
30 | 30 | | communities in this state. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) The attorney general shall request proposals for the |
---|
32 | 32 | | award of grants under this section. The attorney general shall |
---|
33 | 33 | | evaluate the proposals and award grants based on the need for |
---|
34 | 34 | | domestic violence services in the community in which the team is |
---|
35 | 35 | | located and the effectiveness or potential effectiveness of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | team. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (c-1) In awarding grants under this section, the attorney |
---|
38 | 38 | | general shall prioritize a municipality with a population of more |
---|
39 | 39 | | than 1.18 million and located predominantly in a county that has a |
---|
40 | 40 | | total area of less than 1,000 square miles. This subsection expires |
---|
41 | 41 | | September 1, 2017. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (d) A grant recipient may use grant money received under |
---|
43 | 43 | | this section only to fund the activities of a domestic violence high |
---|
44 | 44 | | risk team in reducing or preventing incidents of domestic violence |
---|
45 | 45 | | and providing domestic violence services to victims. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (e) The attorney general shall establish procedures to |
---|
47 | 47 | | administer the grant program, including a procedure for the |
---|
48 | 48 | | submission of a proposal and a procedure to be used by the attorney |
---|
49 | 49 | | general in evaluating a proposal. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (f) To supplement any appropriations for the grant program, |
---|
51 | 51 | | the attorney general shall apply for any available federal grant |
---|
52 | 52 | | funds for the prevention of domestic violence. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
54 | 54 | | * * * * * |
---|