E
|
06/16/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/16/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/26/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2404
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4570
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2163
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1293
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2672
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2477
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1393
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 565
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|