E
|
06/15/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/29/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3440
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2862
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3102
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2452
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1972
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1293
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
1-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4106
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1611
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2446
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1300
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1243
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1242
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
FA2 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1242
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 1242
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 1242
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Bettencourt
|
Journal Page: 1241
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1240
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1240
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1160
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 567
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|