LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1760
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1760
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1760
Compare Versions
SB1760 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1760 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1760 Enrolled May 27, 2015
SB1760 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1760 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB1760 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
SB1760 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1760 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1760 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1760 Enrolled May 27, 2015
SB1760 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
SB1760 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB1760 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
SB1760 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare