E | 05/22/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1490 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3005 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#873 | Journal Page: 3004 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3004 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amendment tabled | 1-Clardy and K. King | Journal Page: 3003 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3003 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 704 | Journal Page: 2915 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3111 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2341 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1783 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 971 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Ellis | Journal Page: 970 |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 970 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 817 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |