Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1791 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/14/2015

                    By: Ellis S.B. No. 1791
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 14, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 14, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to disclosures on selection or modification of an account
 by a customer of a financial institution.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 113.053, Estates Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 113.053.  REQUIRED DISCLOSURE; USE OF FORM[;
 DISCLOSURE].  (a)  A financial institution shall disclose the
 information provided in this subchapter to a customer at the time
 the customer selects or modifies an account.  A financial
 institution is considered to have [adequately] disclosed the
 information provided in this subchapter if:
 (1)  the financial institution uses the form provided
 by Section 113.052; and
 (2)  the customer places the customer's initials to the
 right of each paragraph of the form.
 (b)  If a financial institution varies the format of the form
 provided by Section 113.052, the financial institution may make
 disclosures in the account agreement or in any other form that
 [adequately] discloses the information provided by this
 subchapter.  Disclosures under this subsection must:
 (1)  be given separately from other account
 information;
 (2)  be provided before account selection or
 modification;
 (3)  be printed in 14-point boldfaced type; and
 (4)  if the discussions that precede the account
 opening or modification are conducted primarily in a language other
 than English, be in that language.
 (c)  The financial institution shall notify the customer of
 the type of account the customer selected [If the customer receives
 adequate disclosure of the ownership rights to an account and the
 names of the parties are appropriately indicated, a financial
 institution may combine any of the provisions in, and vary the
 format of, the form and notices described in Section 113.052 in:
 [(1)     a universal account form with options listed for
 selection and additional disclosures provided in the account
 agreement; or
 [(2)     any other manner that adequately discloses the
 information provided by this subchapter].
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an account created or
 modified on or after the effective date of this Act. An account
 created or modified before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the account was created or
 modified, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *