E
|
06/03/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/03/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3919
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1237
|
Journal Page: 3918
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3918
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 3918
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3918
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2008
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1434
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 678
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 677
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 677
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 677
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 692
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 639
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 326
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 268
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 245
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|