LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB18
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB18
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB18
Compare Versions
SB18 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB18 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB18 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB18 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB18 Engrossed April 7, 2015
SB18 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB18 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB18 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB18 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB18 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB18 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB18 Engrossed April 7, 2015
SB18 Comm Sub March 30, 2015
SB18 Introduced February 11, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare