Senate | 05/20/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres | Journal Page: 595 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 595 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |