Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1819 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 1819
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Subcommittee on Border Security;
 April 6, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute to Committee on Veteran Affairs and Military
 Installations; April 13, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 3;
 April 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1819 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination of resident status of students by
 public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 54.052, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this section, a
 person who is not authorized under federal statute to be present in
 the United States may not be considered a resident of this state for
 purposes of this title.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.053, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 54.053.  INFORMATION REQUIRED TO ESTABLISH RESIDENT
 STATUS.  (a)  A person shall submit the following information to an
 institution of higher education to establish resident status under
 this subchapter:
 (1)  if the person applies for resident status under
 Section 54.052(a)(1):
 (A)  a statement of the dates and length of time
 the person has resided in this state, as relevant to establish
 resident status under this subchapter; and
 (B)  a statement by the person that the person's
 presence in this state for that period was for a purpose of
 establishing and maintaining a domicile;
 (2)  if the person applies for resident status under
 Section 54.052(a)(2):
 (A)  a statement of the dates and length of time
 any parent of the person has resided in this state, as relevant to
 establish resident status under this subchapter; and
 (B)  a statement by the parent or, if the parent is
 unable or unwilling to provide the statement, a statement by the
 person that the parent's presence in this state for that period was
 for a purpose of establishing and maintaining a domicile; or
 (3)  if the person applies for resident status under
 Section 54.052(a)(3):
 (A)  a statement of the dates and length of time
 the person has resided in this state, as relevant to establish
 resident status under this subchapter; and
 (B)  if the person is not a citizen or permanent
 resident of the United States, an affidavit stating that the person
 will apply to become a permanent resident of the United States as
 soon as the person becomes eligible to apply.
 (b)  In addition to the information required by Subsection
 (a), an institution of higher education may establish a policy
 requiring a person for whom a residency determination is being made
 to submit specific documentation to verify to the satisfaction of
 the institution that the person is authorized under federal statute
 to be present in the United States.  A policy adopted under this
 subsection must provide for treating each person in a consistent
 manner concerning:
 (1)  whether documentation is required; and
 (2)  to the extent practicable, the type of
 documentation required.
 SECTION 3.  Section 54.055, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), an institution of
 higher education may not, on the basis of Section 54.052(c),
 reclassify as a nonresident of this state a student classified as a
 resident under Section 54.052(a)(3) if, not later than the
 beginning of the 2015-2016 academic year, the student has completed
 at least 30 semester credit hours at an institution of higher
 education.
 SECTION 4.  Except as provided by Section 54.055(c),
 Education Code, as added by this Act, a public institution of higher
 education in this state may, for any semester or academic term,
 before the beginning of that semester or academic term, reclassify
 as a nonresident a student previously classified as a resident of
 this state by the institution or another public institution of
 higher education in this state before the enactment of Section
 54.052(c), Education Code, as added by this Act, if the student is
 not authorized by law to be present in the United States.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *