E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6045
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3624
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3622
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5695
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2669
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1556
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4817
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4793
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4468
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2341
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2142
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1213
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 709
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|