8 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 5 | | relating to a study and report on the awarding of the Texas |
---|
10 | 6 | | Legislative Medal of Honor. |
---|
11 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 8 | | SECTION 1. (a) The standing committees of both houses of |
---|
13 | 9 | | the legislature with primary jurisdiction over military and |
---|
14 | 10 | | veterans affairs shall conduct a joint study on the nomination and |
---|
15 | 11 | | selection process for the award of the Texas Legislative Medal of |
---|
16 | 12 | | Honor. The study must evaluate: |
---|
17 | 13 | | (1) the military tradition for a medal of honor and |
---|
18 | 14 | | methods to ensure that the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor upholds |
---|
19 | 15 | | that military tradition; |
---|
20 | 16 | | (2) how a service member is nominated and methods to |
---|
21 | 17 | | ensure that the service member is nominated based only on the merit |
---|
22 | 18 | | of the service performed by the service member; and |
---|
23 | 19 | | (3) a process by which the adjutant general may |
---|
24 | 20 | | evaluate the qualifications of nominees for the Texas Legislative |
---|
25 | 21 | | Medal of Honor. |
---|
26 | 22 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2016, the standing committees |
---|
27 | 23 | | of both houses of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over |
---|
28 | 24 | | military and veterans affairs shall jointly submit to the governor, |
---|
29 | 25 | | the lieutenant governor, and the legislature a written report that |
---|
30 | 26 | | summarizes the findings of the study conducted under Subsection (a) |
---|
31 | 27 | | of this section. |
---|
32 | 28 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
33 | 29 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
34 | 30 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
35 | 31 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
36 | 32 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
| 33 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 34 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 35 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the Senate on |
---|
| 36 | + | April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
| 37 | + | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the |
---|
| 38 | + | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 39 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 40 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 41 | + | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the House, with |
---|
| 42 | + | amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
| 43 | + | Nays 0, two present not voting. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 46 | + | Approved: |
---|
| 47 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 48 | + | Date |
---|
| 49 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 50 | + | Governor |
---|