Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1824 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1824


 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report on the awarding of the Texas
 Legislative Medal of Honor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  The standing committees of both houses of
 the legislature with primary jurisdiction over military and
 veterans affairs shall conduct a joint study on the nomination and
 selection process for the award of the Texas Legislative Medal of
 Honor. The study must evaluate:
 (1)  the military tradition for a medal of honor and
 methods to ensure that the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor upholds
 that military tradition;
 (2)  how a service member is nominated and methods to
 ensure that the service member is nominated based only on the merit
 of the service performed by the service member; and
 (3)  a process by which the adjutant general may
 evaluate the qualifications of nominees for the Texas Legislative
 Medal of Honor.
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2016, the standing committees
 of both houses of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over
 military and veterans affairs shall jointly submit to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, and the legislature a written report that
 summarizes the findings of the study conducted under Subsection (a)
 of this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor