E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1602
|
Journal Page: 4932
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4932
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2160
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1783
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3895
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3895
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3547
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1602
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1491
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#881
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3012
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Amended
|
1-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 102
|
Journal Page: 2955
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3111
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1249
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1174
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 595
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|