LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1828
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1828
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1828
Compare Versions
SB1828 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1828 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1828 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1828 Comm Sub May 8, 2015
SB1828 Engrossed April 29, 2015
SB1828 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB1828 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1828 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1828 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1828 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1828 Comm Sub May 8, 2015
SB1828 Engrossed April 29, 2015
SB1828 Comm Sub April 23, 2015
SB1828 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare