Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1828 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1828


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the offense of cargo theft.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Article 13.08, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended to read as follows:
 Art. 13.08.  THEFT; ORGANIZED RETAIL THEFT; CARGO THEFT.
 SECTION 2.  Article 13.08(b), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  An offense under Section 31.16 or 31.18, Penal Code, may
 be prosecuted in any county in which an underlying theft could have
 been prosecuted as a separate offense.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 31, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Section 31.18 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.18.  CARGO THEFT. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Cargo" means goods, as defined by Section 7.102,
 Business & Commerce Code, that constitute, wholly or partly, a
 commercial shipment of freight moving in commerce.  A shipment is
 considered to be moving in commerce if the shipment is located at
 any point between the point of origin and the final point of
 destination regardless of any temporary stop that is made for the
 purpose of transshipment or otherwise.
 (2)  "Vehicle" has the meaning assigned by Section
 541.201, Transportation Code.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person:
 (1)  knowingly or intentionally conducts, promotes, or
 facilitates an activity in which the person receives, possesses,
 conceals, stores, barters, sells, abandons, or disposes of:
 (A)  stolen cargo; or
 (B)  cargo explicitly represented to the person as
 being stolen cargo; or
 (2)  is employed as a driver lawfully contracted to
 transport a specific cargo by vehicle from a known point of origin
 to a known point of destination and, with the intent to conduct,
 promote, or facilitate an activity described by Subsection (b)(1),
 knowingly or intentionally:
 (A)  fails to deliver the entire cargo to the
 known point of destination as contracted; or
 (B)  causes the seal to be broken on the vehicle or
 on an intermodal container containing any part of the cargo.
 (c)  An offense under this section is:
 (1)  a state jail felony if the total value of the cargo
 involved in the activity is $1,500 or more but less than $10,000;
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if the total value of
 the cargo involved in the activity is $10,000 or more but less than
 $100,000;
 (3)  a felony of the second degree if the total value of
 the cargo involved in the activity is $100,000 or more but less than
 $200,000; or
 (4)  a felony of the first degree if the total value of
 the cargo involved in the activity is $200,000 or more.
 (d)  For purposes of Subsection (c), the total value of the
 cargo involved in the activity includes the value of any vehicle
 stolen or damaged in the course of the same criminal episode as the
 conduct that is the subject of the prosecution.
 (e)  An offense described for purposes of punishment by
 Subsections (c)(1)-(3) is increased to the next higher category of
 offense if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the person
 organized, supervised, financed, or managed one or more other
 persons engaged in an activity described by Subsection (b).
 (f)  It is not a defense to prosecution under this section
 that:
 (1)  the offense occurred as a result of a deception or
 strategy on the part of a law enforcement agency, including the use
 of:
 (A)  an undercover operative or peace officer; or
 (B)  a bait vehicle;
 (2)  the actor was provided by a law enforcement agency
 with a facility in which to commit the offense or with an
 opportunity to engage in conduct constituting the offense; or
 (3)  the actor was solicited to commit the offense by a
 peace officer, and the solicitation was of a type that would
 encourage a person predisposed to commit the offense to actually
 commit the offense but would not encourage a person not predisposed
 to commit the offense to actually commit the offense.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1828 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1; May 14,
 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and requested
 appointment of Conference Committee; May 20, 2015, House granted
 request of the Senate; May 29, 2015, Senate adopted Conference
 Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1828 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 135,
 Nays 2, one present not voting; May 20, 2015, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee; May 23,
 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the following
 vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor