E | 06/19/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/19/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3648 | |
E | 05/30/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3592 | |
House | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5692 | |
Senate | 05/30/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3503 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3439 | |
Senate | 05/28/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2665 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Record vote | RV#1556 | Journal Page: 4815 |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4815 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4782 | |
House | 05/27/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/26/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1238 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1198 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 137 | |
Senate | 11/13/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/13/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |