Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1845 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1845
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1845 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to employment of a statewide data coordinator in the
 Department of Information Resources.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.0286 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.0286.  STATEWIDE DATA COORDINATOR. (a)  The
 executive director, using existing department funds, shall employ a
 statewide data coordinator to:
 (1)  improve the control and security of information
 collected by state agencies;
 (2)  promote between state agencies the sharing of
 information, including customer information; and
 (3)  reduce information collection costs incurred by
 this state.
 (b)  The statewide data coordinator shall develop and
 implement best practices among state agencies to:
 (1)  improve interagency information coordination;
 (2)  reduce duplicative information collection;
 (3)  increase accountability and ensure compliance
 with statutes and rules requiring agencies to share information;
 (4)  improve information management and analysis to
 increase information security, uncover fraud and waste, reduce
 agency costs, improve agency operations, and verify compliance with
 applicable laws; and
 (5)  encourage agencies to collect and post on the
 agencies' Internet websites information related to agency
 functions that is in an open source format and is machine-readable,
 exportable, and easily accessible by the public.
 (c)  Each state agency shall cooperate with the statewide
 data coordinator in fulfilling the requirements of this section.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the executive director of the Department of
 Information Resources shall employ a statewide data coordinator as
 required by Section 2054.0286, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *