Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1855 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 1855
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; May 12, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1855 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to appeals of certain determinations by an animal control
 authority or certain courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 822.042(e), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  The court shall order the animal control authority to
 humanely destroy the dog if the owner has not complied with
 Subsection (a) before the 11th day after the date on which the dog
 is seized or delivered to the authority, except that,
 notwithstanding any other law or local regulation, the court may
 not order the destruction of a dog during the pendency of an appeal
 under Section 822.0424. The court shall order the authority to
 return the dog to the owner if the owner complies with Subsection
 (a) before the 11th day after the date on which the dog is seized or
 delivered to the authority.
 SECTION 2.  Section 822.0421, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 822.0421.  DETERMINATION THAT DOG IS DANGEROUS.
 (a)  If a person reports an incident described by Section
 822.041(2), the animal control authority may investigate the
 incident. If, after receiving the sworn statements of any
 witnesses, the animal control authority determines the dog is a
 dangerous dog, the animal control authority [it] shall notify the
 owner in writing of the determination [that fact].
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, including a municipal
 ordinance, an [An] owner, not later than the 15th day after the date
 the owner is notified that a dog owned by the owner is a dangerous
 dog, may appeal the determination of the animal control authority
 to a justice, county, or municipal court of competent jurisdiction.
 (c)  To file an appeal under Subsection (b), the owner must:
 (1)  file a notice of appeal of the animal control
 authority's dangerous dog determination with the court;
 (2)  attach a copy of the determination from the animal
 control authority; and
 (3)  serve a copy of the notice of appeal on the animal
 control authority by mailing the notice through the United States
 Postal Service.
 (d)  An owner may appeal the decision of the justice[,
 county,] or municipal court under Subsection (b) in the [same]
 manner described by Section 822.0424 [as appeal for other cases
 from the justice, county, or municipal court].
 SECTION 3.  Section 822.0423, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) and amending Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (c-1)  The court shall determine the estimated costs to house
 and care for the impounded dog during the appeal process and shall
 set the amount of bond for an appeal adequate to cover those
 estimated costs.
 (d)  An owner or person filing the action may appeal the
 decision of the municipal or [court,] justice court[, or county
 court] in the manner described by Section 822.0424 [provided for
 the appeal of cases from the municipal, justice, or county court].
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 822, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 822.0424 to read as follows:
 Sec. 822.0424.  APPEAL. (a)  A party to an appeal under
 Section 822.0421(d) or a hearing under Section 822.0423 may appeal
 the decision to a county court or county court at law in the county
 in which the justice or municipal court is located and is entitled
 to a jury trial on request.
 (b)  As a condition of perfecting an appeal, not later than
 the 10th calendar day after the date the decision is issued, the
 appellant must file a notice of appeal and, if applicable, an appeal
 bond in the amount determined by the court from which the appeal is
 taken.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Section 30.00014, Government Code, or
 any other law, a person filing an appeal from a municipal court
 under Subsection (a) is not required to file a motion for a new
 trial to perfect an appeal.
 (d)  A decision of a county court or county court at law under
 this section may be appealed in the same manner as an appeal for any
 other case in a county court or county court at law.
 (e)  Notwithstanding any other law, a county court or a
 county court at law has jurisdiction to hear an appeal filed under
 this section.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a determination, decision, or hearing under Section 822.0421 or
 822.0423, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, or Section
 822.0424, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, that occurs
 on or after the effective date of this Act. A determination,
 decision, or hearing that occurs before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the determination,
 decision, or hearing occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *