E
|
06/18/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5569
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3215
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4690
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1525
|
Journal Page: 4689
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4689
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4689
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4536
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Galindo
|
Journal Page: 4536
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4536
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Government Transparency & Operation
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 600
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|