LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1877
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1877
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1877
Compare Versions
SB1877 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1877 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1877 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1877 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB1877 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB1877 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
SB1877 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB1877 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1877 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB1877 Enrolled May 29, 2015
SB1877 Comm Sub May 19, 2015
SB1877 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB1877 Comm Sub April 20, 2015
SB1877 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare