Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1877 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1877


 AN ACT
 relating to the development and maintenance by each state agency of
 a data use agreement for the state agency's employees and to
 training related to that agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.134 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.134.  DATA USE AGREEMENT. (a)  Each state agency
 shall develop a data use agreement for use by the agency that meets
 the particular needs of the agency and is consistent with rules
 adopted by the department that relate to information security
 standards for state agencies.
 (b)  A state agency shall update the data use agreement at
 least biennially, but may update the agreement at any time as
 necessary to accommodate best practices in data management.
 (c)  A state agency shall distribute the data use agreement
 developed under this section, and each update to that agreement, to
 employees of the agency who handle sensitive information, including
 financial, medical, personnel, or student data. The employee shall
 sign the data use agreement distributed and each update to the
 agreement.
 (d)  To the extent possible, a state agency shall provide
 employees described by Subsection (c) with cybersecurity awareness
 training to coincide with the distribution of:
 (1)  the data use agreement required under this
 section; and
 (2)  each biennial update to that agreement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1877 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1877 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor