E | 06/16/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 06/16/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3647 | |
E | 05/26/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2404 | |
House | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4570 | |
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2089 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2163 | |
Senate | 05/24/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1963 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4355 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Record vote | RV#1390 | Journal Page: 4354 |
House | 05/24/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/24/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4354 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4278 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4278 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4088 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 05/01/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2340 | |
House | 04/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 706 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 01/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 138 | |
Senate | 11/24/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/24/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |