Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB188 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 188
 (In the Senate - Filed November 24, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 1; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain insurers' insurance rating and underwriting
 practices based on certain consumer inquiries.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 544.552, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 544.552.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only
 to a standard fire, homeowners, or farm and ranch owners insurance
 policy, including such policies written by:
 (1)  a farm mutual insurance company;
 (2)  a county mutual insurance company;
 (3)  a Lloyd's plan; and
 (4)  a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an underwriting
 decision made on or after the effective date of this Act or a rate
 for an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after that date. An underwriting decision made before
 the effective date of this Act or a rate for a policy delivered,
 issued for delivery, or renewed before that date is governed by the
 law as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act,
 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *