E
|
06/10/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
E
|
05/21/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4082
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1850
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1757
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1072
|
Journal Page: 3412
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3412
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3412
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3348
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 2039
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2447
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1214
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1125
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|