Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1889 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-84R27855 MCK-D
2- By: Zaffirini, et al. S.B. No. 1889
3- (Burkett, Raymond)
4- Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1889: No.
1+S.B. No. 1889
52
63
7- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
84 AN ACT
95 relating to the definition of neglect of a child, the exclusion of
106 certain information from the Department of Family and Protective
117 Services central registry of child abuse or neglect cases, and the
128 report of certain information regarding those cases to the
139 legislature.
1410 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1511 SECTION 1. Section 261.001(4), Family Code, is amended to
1612 read as follows:
1713 (4) "Neglect":
1814 (A) includes:
1915 (i) [(A)] the leaving of a child in a
2016 situation where the child would be exposed to a substantial risk of
2117 physical or mental harm, without arranging for necessary care for
2218 the child, and the demonstration of an intent not to return by a
2319 parent, guardian, or managing or possessory conservator of the
2420 child;
2521 (ii) [(B)] the following acts or omissions
2622 by a person:
2723 (a) [(i)] placing a child in or
2824 failing to remove a child from a situation that a reasonable person
2925 would realize requires judgment or actions beyond the child's level
3026 of maturity, physical condition, or mental abilities and that
3127 results in bodily injury or a substantial risk of immediate harm to
3228 the child;
3329 (b) [(ii)] failing to seek, obtain,
3430 or follow through with medical care for a child, with the failure
3531 resulting in or presenting a substantial risk of death,
3632 disfigurement, or bodily injury or with the failure resulting in an
3733 observable and material impairment to the growth, development, or
3834 functioning of the child;
3935 (c) [(iii)] the failure to provide a
4036 child with food, clothing, or shelter necessary to sustain the life
4137 or health of the child, excluding failure caused primarily by
4238 financial inability unless relief services had been offered and
4339 refused;
4440 (d) [(iv)] placing a child in or
4541 failing to remove the child from a situation in which the child
4642 would be exposed to a substantial risk of sexual conduct harmful to
4743 the child; or
4844 (e) [(v)] placing a child in or
4945 failing to remove the child from a situation in which the child
5046 would be exposed to acts or omissions that constitute abuse under
5147 Subdivision (1)(E), (F), (G), (H), or (K) committed against another
5248 child; or
5349 (iii) [(C)] the failure by the person
5450 responsible for a child's care, custody, or welfare to permit the
5551 child to return to the child's home without arranging for the
5652 necessary care for the child after the child has been absent from
5753 the home for any reason, including having been in residential
5854 placement or having run away; and
5955 (B) does not include the refusal by a person
6056 responsible for a child's care, custody, or welfare to permit the
6157 child to remain in or return to the child's home resulting in the
6258 placement of the child in the conservatorship of the department if:
6359 (i) the child has a severe emotional
6460 disturbance;
6561 (ii) the person's refusal is based solely on
6662 the person's inability to obtain mental health services necessary
6763 to protect the safety and well-being of the child; and
6864 (iii) the person has exhausted all
6965 reasonable means available to the person to obtain the mental
7066 health services described by Subparagraph (ii).
7167 SECTION 2. Section 261.002(b), Family Code, as amended by
7268 S.B. No. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
7369 is amended to read as follows:
7470 (b) The executive commissioner shall [may] adopt rules
7571 necessary to carry out this section. The rules shall:
7672 (1) prohibit the department from making a finding of
7773 abuse or neglect against a person in a case in which the department
7874 is named managing conservator of a child who has a severe emotional
7975 disturbance only because the child's family is unable to obtain
8076 mental health services for the child; and
8177 (2) establish guidelines for reviewing the records in
8278 the registry and removing those records in which the department was
8379 named managing conservator of a child who has a severe emotional
8480 disturbance only because the child's family was unable to obtain
8581 mental health services for the child [provide for cooperation with
8682 local child service agencies, including hospitals, clinics, and
8783 schools, and cooperation with other states in exchanging reports to
8884 effect a national registration system].
8985 SECTION 3. Section 262.352, Family Code, is amended to read
9086 as follows:
9187 Sec. 262.352. JOINT MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHILD.
9288 (a) Before the department files a suit affecting the parent-child
9389 relationship requesting managing conservatorship [a person
9490 relinquishes custody] of a child who suffers from a severe
9591 emotional disturbance in order to obtain mental health services for
9692 the child, the department must, unless [if] it is not in the best
9793 interest of the child, discuss with the child's parent or legal
9894 guardian [person relinquishing custody of the child] the option of
9995 seeking a court order for joint managing conservatorship of the
10096 child with the department.
10197 (b) Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year,
10298 the department shall report the following information to the
10399 legislature:
104100 (1) with respect to children described by Subsection
105101 (a):
106102 (A) the number of children for whom the
107103 department has been appointed managing conservator;
108104 (B) the number of children for whom the
109105 department has been appointed joint managing conservator; and
110106 (C) the number of children who were diverted to
111107 community or residential mental health services through another
112108 agency; and
113109 (2) the number of persons whose names were entered
114110 into the central registry of cases of child abuse and neglect only
115111 because the department was named managing conservator of a child
116112 who has a severe emotional disturbance because the child's family
117113 was unable to obtain mental health services for the child.
118114 (c) Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1,
119115 2019.
120116 SECTION 4. Section 262.353, Family Code, is repealed.
121117 SECTION 5. The Department of Family and Protective Services
122118 shall implement the changes in law made by this Act using funds
123119 appropriated to the department for the state fiscal biennium ending
124120 August 31, 2017.
125121 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
122+ ______________________________ ______________________________
123+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
124+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1889 passed the Senate on
125+ April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
126+ the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 20, 2015, by the
127+ following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
128+ ______________________________
129+ Secretary of the Senate
130+ I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1889 passed the House, with
131+ amendment, on May 14, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
132+ Nays 0, one present not voting.
133+ ______________________________
134+ Chief Clerk of the House
135+ Approved:
136+ ______________________________
137+ Date
138+ ______________________________
139+ Governor