Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1900 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Campbell S.B. No. 1900
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; May 11, 2015,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 3; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1900 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to funding for an open-enrollment charter school based on
 average amounts collected by school districts under the
 instructional facilities allotment and the existing debt
 allotment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.106, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  In addition to other amounts provided by this section, a
 charter holder is entitled to receive for the open-enrollment
 charter school funding per student in average daily attendance in
 an amount equal to the state average amount of revenue per student
 in average daily attendance collected by independent school
 districts under Sections 46.003(a) and 46.032(a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.106(d), Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies to funding per student in average daily
 attendance at an open-enrollment charter school for the 2015-2016
 and 2016-2017 school years only if the 84th Legislature makes a
 specific appropriation to implement that provision.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *