1 | 1 | | By: Watson S.B. No. 1917 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to contributions to the Employees Retirement System of |
---|
7 | 7 | | Texas. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 815.402(a), Government Code is amended |
---|
10 | 10 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) Except as provided by Section 813.201, each payroll |
---|
12 | 12 | | period, each department or agency of the state shall cause to be |
---|
13 | 13 | | deducted from each member's compensation a contribution of: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) 8.0 [6.6 percent of the compensation if the member |
---|
15 | 15 | | is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after |
---|
16 | 16 | | August 31, 2013, and before September 1, 2014; |
---|
17 | 17 | | [(2) 6.9 percent of the compensation if the member is |
---|
18 | 18 | | not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August |
---|
19 | 19 | | 31, 2014, and before September 1, 2015; |
---|
20 | 20 | | [(3) 7.2] percent of the compensation if the member is not a |
---|
21 | 21 | | member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31, |
---|
22 | 22 | | 2015, and before September 1, 2017 [2016]; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (2) [(4) 7.5 percent of the compensation if the member |
---|
24 | 24 | | is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after |
---|
25 | 25 | | August 31, 2016; |
---|
26 | 26 | | [(5)] for service by a member who is not a member of the |
---|
27 | 27 | | legislature rendered on or after September 1, 2017, the lesser of: |
---|
28 | 28 | | (A) 8.0 [7.5] percent of the member's annual |
---|
29 | 29 | | compensation; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (B) a percentage of the member's annual |
---|
31 | 31 | | compensation equal to 8.0 [7.5] percent reduced by one-tenth of one |
---|
32 | 32 | | percent for each one-tenth of one percent that the state |
---|
33 | 33 | | contribution rate for the fiscal year to which the service relates |
---|
34 | 34 | | is less than the state contribution rate established for the 2017 |
---|
35 | 35 | | [2015] fiscal year; or |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) [(6)] eight percent of the compensation if the |
---|
37 | 37 | | member is a member of the legislature. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. Section 815.403(a)(1), Government Code is |
---|
39 | 39 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) an amount equal to 10.0 [7.4] percent of the total |
---|
41 | 41 | | compensation of all members of the retirement system for that year; |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 3. Section 815.4035(a), Government Code is amended |
---|
43 | 43 | | to read as follows: |
---|
44 | 44 | | Sec. 815.4035. COLLECTION OF STATE RETIREMENT |
---|
45 | 45 | | CONTRIBUTION. (a) Except as provided by Section 813.201, the board |
---|
46 | 46 | | of trustees shall assess each employer whose employees are members |
---|
47 | 47 | | of the retirement system a state retirement contribution in an |
---|
48 | 48 | | amount equal to 1.0 [0.5] percent of the employer's total payroll, |
---|
49 | 49 | | as determined by the General Appropriations Act. |
---|
50 | 50 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|