Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1917 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1917


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contributions to the Employees Retirement System of
 Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 815.402(a), Government Code is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 813.201, each payroll
 period, each department or agency of the state shall cause to be
 deducted from each member's compensation a contribution of:
 (1)  8.0 [6.6 percent of the compensation if the member
 is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after
 August 31, 2013, and before September 1, 2014;
 [(2) 6.9 percent of the compensation if the member is
 not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after August
 31, 2014, and before September 1, 2015;
 [(3) 7.2] percent of the compensation if the member is not a
 member of the legislature, for service rendered after August 31,
 2015, and before September 1, 2017 [2016];
 (2)  [(4) 7.5 percent of the compensation if the member
 is not a member of the legislature, for service rendered after
 August 31, 2016;
 [(5)] for service by a member who is not a member of the
 legislature rendered on or after September 1, 2017, the lesser of:
 (A)  8.0 [7.5] percent of the member's annual
 compensation; or
 (B)  a percentage of the member's annual
 compensation equal to 8.0 [7.5] percent reduced by one-tenth of one
 percent for each one-tenth of one percent that the state
 contribution rate for the fiscal year to which the service relates
 is less than the state contribution rate established for the 2017
 [2015] fiscal year; or
 (3) [(6)]  eight percent of the compensation if the
 member is a member of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  Section 815.403(a)(1), Government Code is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  an amount equal to 10.0 [7.4] percent of the total
 compensation of all members of the retirement system for that year;
 SECTION 3.  Section 815.4035(a), Government Code is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 815.4035.  COLLECTION OF STATE RETIREMENT
 CONTRIBUTION. (a) Except as provided by Section 813.201, the board
 of trustees shall assess each employer whose employees are members
 of the retirement system a state retirement contribution in an
 amount equal to 1.0 [0.5] percent of the employer's total payroll,
 as determined by the General Appropriations Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.