1 | 1 | | By: Watson S.B. No. 1919 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 30, 2015, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1919 By: Huffines |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the establishment of a variable speed limit pilot |
---|
14 | 14 | | program by the Texas Transportation Commission. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. DEFINITIONS. In this Act: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Commission" means the Texas Transportation |
---|
18 | 18 | | Commission. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Department" means the Texas Department of |
---|
20 | 20 | | Transportation. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. VARIABLE SPEED LIMIT PILOT PROGRAM. (a) The |
---|
22 | 22 | | commission by rule shall establish and the department shall |
---|
23 | 23 | | implement a variable speed limit pilot program to study the |
---|
24 | 24 | | effectiveness of temporarily lowering prima facie speed limits to |
---|
25 | 25 | | address inclement weather, congestion, road construction, or any |
---|
26 | 26 | | other condition that affects the safe and orderly movement of |
---|
27 | 27 | | traffic on a roadway. Notice of a speed limit established under the |
---|
28 | 28 | | pilot program may be displayed using a stationary or portable |
---|
29 | 29 | | changeable message sign, as defined by Section 544.013, |
---|
30 | 30 | | Transportation Code. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (b) The commission shall select up to 10 locations to test |
---|
32 | 32 | | the pilot program. |
---|
33 | 33 | | (c) The commission shall inform the Department of Public |
---|
34 | 34 | | Safety and any affected local law enforcement agency about the |
---|
35 | 35 | | pilot program and the locations that are being used to test the |
---|
36 | 36 | | pilot program. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (d) A speed limit that is established under the pilot |
---|
38 | 38 | | program: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) must be based on an engineering and traffic |
---|
40 | 40 | | investigation; |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) may be effective for all or a designated portion of |
---|
42 | 42 | | the highway and may be effective for any period of the day or night, |
---|
43 | 43 | | as the department determines necessary; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (3) is effective only when the speed limit is posted |
---|
45 | 45 | | and only if a sign notifying motorists of the change in speed limit |
---|
46 | 46 | | is posted not less than 500 feet but not more than 1,000 feet before |
---|
47 | 47 | | the point at which the speed limit begins. |
---|
48 | 48 | | SECTION 3. REPORT. Not later than December 31, 2016, the |
---|
49 | 49 | | commission shall submit a report to the legislature that includes |
---|
50 | 50 | | information about the pilot program, the results of the pilot |
---|
51 | 51 | | program, and any recommendations for statutory changes based on the |
---|
52 | 52 | | results of the pilot program. |
---|
53 | 53 | | SECTION 4. EXPIRATION. This Act expires February 1, 2017. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 5. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect |
---|
55 | 55 | | immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members |
---|
56 | 56 | | elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas |
---|
57 | 57 | | Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for |
---|
58 | 58 | | immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
59 | 59 | | * * * * * |
---|