Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1919 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 1919
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 30, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1919 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a variable speed limit pilot
 program by the Texas Transportation Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Transportation
 Commission.
 (2)  "Department" means the Texas Department of
 Transportation.
 SECTION 2.  VARIABLE SPEED LIMIT PILOT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 commission by rule shall establish and the department shall
 implement a variable speed limit pilot program to study the
 effectiveness of temporarily lowering prima facie speed limits to
 address inclement weather, congestion, road construction, or any
 other condition that affects the safe and orderly movement of
 traffic on a roadway.  Notice of a speed limit established under the
 pilot program may be displayed using a stationary or portable
 changeable message sign, as defined by Section 544.013,
 Transportation Code.
 (b)  The commission shall select up to 10 locations to test
 the pilot program.
 (c)  The commission shall inform the Department of Public
 Safety and any affected local law enforcement agency about the
 pilot program and the locations that are being used to test the
 pilot program.
 (d)  A speed limit that is established under the pilot
 program:
 (1)  must be based on an engineering and traffic
 investigation;
 (2)  may be effective for all or a designated portion of
 the highway and may be effective for any period of the day or night,
 as the department determines necessary; and
 (3)  is effective only when the speed limit is posted
 and only if a sign notifying motorists of the change in speed limit
 is posted not less than 500 feet but not more than 1,000 feet before
 the point at which the speed limit begins.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 31, 2016, the
 commission shall submit a report to the legislature that includes
 information about the pilot program, the results of the pilot
 program, and any recommendations for statutory changes based on the
 results of the pilot program.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires February 1, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *