House | 05/26/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4467 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3106 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2450 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1340 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1291 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1160 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 605 | |
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |