E
|
05/19/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
E
|
05/07/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2807
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1400
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1438
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1351
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 67
|
Journal Page: 2457
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 548
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 420
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
11/25/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/25/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|