E
|
06/20/2015
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1963
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1347
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4232
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4172
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Klick
|
Journal Page: 4172
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4171
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2340
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 731
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 730
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 672
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
01/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 138
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|