LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB195
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB195
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB195
Compare Versions
SB195 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB195 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB195 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB195 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
SB195 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB195 Comm Sub April 1, 2015
SB195 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB195 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB195 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB195 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB195 Comm Sub May 18, 2015
SB195 Engrossed April 9, 2015
SB195 Comm Sub April 1, 2015
SB195 Introduced December 1, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare