Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1970 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Huffman S.B. No. 1970
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 28, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1970 By:  Huffman


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to increasing the electronic filing fee for certain
 courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.851(b), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  In addition to other fees authorized or required by law,
 the clerk of the supreme court, a court of appeals, a district
 court, a county court, a statutory county court, or a statutory
 probate court shall collect a $30 [$20] fee on the filing of any
 civil action or proceeding requiring a filing fee, including an
 appeal, and on the filing of any counterclaim, cross-action,
 intervention, interpleader, or third-party action requiring a
 filing fee to be used as provided by Section 51.852.
 SECTION 2.  (a) Section 51.607, Government Code, does not
 apply to the imposition of a fee assessed under Section 51.851(b),
 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to a fee
 that becomes payable on or after September 1, 2015. A fee that
 becomes payable before that date is governed by the law in effect
 when the fee became payable, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *