Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1056 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1028 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 693 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 620 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 619 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |