Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2001 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Garcia, Campbell S.B. No. 2001
 (In the Senate - Filed March 17, 2015; March 30, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2001 By:  Garcia


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment and operation of the Texas Women
 Veterans Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 434, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. TEXAS WOMEN VETERANS PROGRAM
 Sec. 434.201.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Texas Veterans Commission.
 (2)  "Executive director" means the executive director
 of the commission.
 (3)  "Program" means the Texas Women Veterans Program.
 (4)  "Woman veteran" means a woman who:
 (A)  served on active duty in the armed forces of
 the United States or in the Texas National Guard on federal active
 duty under Title 10, United States Code; and
 (B)  was discharged or released from that service
 under conditions other than dishonorable.
 Sec. 434.202.  ESTABLISHMENT OF PROGRAM; PROGRAM MISSION.
 (a)  The Texas Women Veterans Program is established in the
 commission. The program is attached to the office of the executive
 director for administrative purposes.
 (b)  The mission of the program is to ensure that the women
 veterans of this state have equitable access to federal and state
 veterans' benefits and services.
 Sec. 434.203.  COORDINATOR. The executive director shall
 designate a women veterans coordinator for this state.
 Sec. 434.204.  GENERAL PROGRAM DUTIES. The program shall:
 (1)  provide assistance to the women veterans of this
 state as provided by this subchapter;
 (2)  perform outreach functions to improve the
 awareness of women veterans of their eligibility for federal and
 state veterans' benefits and services;
 (3)  assess the needs of women veterans with respect to
 benefits and services;
 (4)  review programs, research projects, and other
 initiatives designed to address the needs of the women veterans of
 this state;
 (5)  make recommendations to the executive director
 regarding the improvement of benefits and services to women
 veterans; and
 (6)  incorporate issues concerning women veterans in
 commission planning regarding veterans' benefits and services.
 Sec. 434.205.  ADVOCACY AND PUBLIC AWARENESS. (a)  The
 program shall advocate for women veterans and work to increase
 public awareness about the gender-specific needs of women veterans.
 (b)  The program shall recommend legislative initiatives and
 the development of policies on the local, state, and national
 levels to address the issues affecting women veterans.
 Sec. 434.206.  COLLABORATION. The program shall collaborate
 with federal, state, county, municipal, and private agencies that
 provide services to women veterans.
 Sec. 434.207.  RESEARCH; DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION.
 (a)  The program shall monitor and research issues relating to
 women veterans.
 (b)  The program shall disseminate information regarding
 opportunities for women veterans throughout the network of entities
 with which the program collaborates.
 Sec. 434.208.  EDUCATION.  Through conferences, seminars,
 and training workshops with federal, state, county, municipal, and
 private agencies, the program shall provide guidance and direction
 to a woman veteran who is applying for grants, benefits, or
 services.
 Sec. 434.209.  HONOR AND RECOGNITION. The program shall
 promote events and activities that recognize and honor the women
 veterans of this state and women who serve in the military.
 Sec. 434.210.  FACILITIES. To the extent funding is
 available for that purpose, the program shall provide facilities as
 appropriate in support of the program.
 Sec. 434.211.  FUNDING; GRANTS. On behalf of the program,
 the commission may:
 (1)  accept and spend funds:
 (A)  appropriated to the commission for the
 operation of the program; and
 (B)  received from other sources, including
 donations and grants; and
 (2)  provide matching grants to assist in the
 implementation of the program's goals and objectives.
 SECTION 2.  Section 434.017(e), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  To carry out any purpose of this chapter, the commission
 may solicit, accept, or refuse a gift, grant, devise, bequest of
 money, security, service, or property, including money raised or a
 service provided by a volunteer or volunteer group, to promote the
 work of the commission for any purpose related to the fund for
 veterans' assistance.  The commission may participate in the
 establishment and operation of an affiliated nonprofit
 organization that is established for the purpose of raising money
 for or providing services or other benefits to the commission or a
 program established in the commission, including the Texas Women
 Veterans Program.  A gift, grant, devise, or bequest to the fund may
 be appropriated in the same manner as other money in the fund,
 subject to the purposes provided by Subsection (c) and any
 limitation or requirement placed on the gift, grant, devise, or
 bequest by the donor or granting entity.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *