Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2663
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4934
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1407
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4379
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/24/15 2:46 PM
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4295
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1368
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
18-Pea
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment amended
|
23-Pea
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
18-Pea
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4294
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/23/15 6:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 4279
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
20-S. King
|
Journal Page: 4262
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
19-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 4261
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amended
|
18-Pea
|
Journal Page: 4260
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
11-S. King
|
Journal Page: 4256
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(5)
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3845
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 817
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 784
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 783
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Perry
|
Journal Page: 782
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 771
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
Senate
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 349
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|