Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2058 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 84R18054 LED-F
22 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2058
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to food allergen awareness in food service establishments;
88 authorizing a fee; requiring a food allergen awareness
99 certification for certain food service employees.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code, is
1212 amended by adding Subdivisions (5-a), (5-b), and (5-c) to read as
1313 follows:
1414 (5-a) "Major food allergen":
1515 (A) includes:
1616 (i) milk;
1717 (ii) eggs;
1818 (iii) fish, including bass, flounder, and
1919 cod;
2020 (iv) crustaceans, including crab, lobster,
2121 and shrimp;
2222 (v) tree nuts, including almonds, pecans,
2323 and walnuts;
2424 (vi) wheat;
2525 (vii) peanuts;
2626 (viii) soybeans; and
2727 (ix) a food ingredient that contains
2828 protein derived from any of those foods; and
2929 (B) does not include any food ingredient that is
3030 exempt from the food allergen labeling requirements of Section
3131 403(w), Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (21 U.S.C. Section
3232 343).
3333 (5-b) "Menu" means a printed or pictorial display of
3434 food items and prices of those items that are available for sale
3535 from a food service establishment. The term includes a display of
3636 food items that is distributed outside the food service
3737 establishment, a promotional display of food items from which a
3838 customer may place an order, and a display of food items on the food
3939 service establishment's Internet website.
4040 (5-c) "Menu board" means a list or pictorial display of
4141 food items and the prices of those food items posted within or
4242 outside a food service establishment.
4343 SECTION 2. Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
4444 by adding Sections 437.024, 437.025, and 437.026 to read as
4545 follows:
4646 Sec. 437.024. FOOD ALLERGEN NOTICE ON MENUS AND MENU
4747 BOARDS. (a) A food service establishment shall include on each menu
4848 and menu board a clear and conspicuous notice requesting that a
4949 customer notify the server of the customer's allergy to a major food
5050 allergen before placing an order. The notice shall state: "Before
5151 placing your order, please inform your server if a person in your
5252 party has a food allergy."
5353 (b) Except as provided by Subsection (c), a food service
5454 establishment shall ensure that notice described by Subsection (a)
5555 posted on a menu board is easily readable from the point of service
5656 at which a customer orders food. The font size of the notice must be
5757 the same size as or larger than the smallest font size of a menu item
5858 listed on the menu board.
5959 (c) A food service establishment may, instead of posting the
6060 notice described by Subsection (a) on the menu board, post the
6161 notice adjacent to the menu board. The notice posted under this
6262 subsection must be:
6363 (1) securely posted and easily readable from a
6464 distance of five feet by a customer standing at or approaching the
6565 point of service;
6666 (2) directly facing the customer; and
6767 (3) unobstructed from a customer's view.
6868 Sec. 437.025. FOOD ALLERGY AWARE DESIGNATION. (a) The
6969 department shall develop a program to designate certain food
7070 service establishments as food allergy aware. The department shall
7171 maintain a list of food service establishments that receive the
7272 designation on the department's Internet website.
7373 (b) Participation by a food service establishment in the
7474 food allergy aware program is voluntary.
7575 (c) The executive commissioner shall adopt guidelines and
7676 requirements for a food service establishment to receive the food
7777 allergy aware designation. The requirements must include
7878 maintaining on the premises and making available to the public a
7979 master list of all ingredients used in the preparation of each food
8080 item available for consumption.
8181 Sec. 437.026. REQUIRED FOOD ALLERGEN AWARENESS TRAINING AND
8282 CERTIFICATION. (a) In this section:
8383 (1) "Food allergen awareness training and
8484 certification program" means a program approved by the department
8585 under this section.
8686 (2) "Food handler" means a food service employee who
8787 works with unpackaged food, food equipment or utensils, or
8888 food-contact surfaces.
8989 (3) "Food server" includes any food service employee
9090 who takes food orders from customers or delivers food to customers.
9191 (b) Each food handler, food server, and manager employed at
9292 a food service establishment shall successfully complete a food
9393 allergen awareness training and certification program approved by
9494 the department as required by this sections not later than the 30th
9595 day after the date on which the person is hired by the food service
9696 establishment.
9797 (c) Each food handler, food server, and manager who
9898 completes the food allergen awareness training and certification
9999 program must renew the certification every three years while that
100100 person is employed at the food service establishment.
101101 (d) Each manager shall post for display the manager's
102102 certification required by Subsection (b).
103103 (e) A manager shall ensure that at least one person with the
104104 certification required by Subsection (b) is present at the food
105105 service establishment during all hours the establishment provides
106106 food service to customers.
107107 (f) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish
108108 criteria and guidelines for food allergen awareness training and
109109 certification programs. The department may approve food allergen
110110 awareness training and certification programs that meet the
111111 established criteria and guidelines. A food allergen awareness
112112 training and certification program approved by the department must
113113 include training on:
114114 (1) the serious nature of food allergy;
115115 (2) the importance of reading ingredient labels and of
116116 strict allergen avoidance;
117117 (3) the avoidance of cross-contact during food
118118 preparation; and
119119 (4) the means of activating emergency assistance in
120120 the event of an allergic reaction.
121121 (g) The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a fee
122122 for the department to charge in the amount necessary to cover the
123123 costs of administering this section to each person that applies for
124124 the department's approval of a food allergen awareness training and
125125 certification program.
126126 (h) The department at least every five years shall review
127127 each food allergen awareness training and certification program
128128 approved by the department to ensure the program continues to meet
129129 the criteria and guidelines established by rule under this section.
130130 SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive
131131 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall, in
132132 consultation with Food Allergy Research & Education and the Texas
133133 Restaurant Association, adopt rules establishing:
134134 (1) the guidelines and requirements for a food allergy
135135 aware designation as required by Section 437.025, Health and Safety
136136 Code, as added by this Act; and
137137 (2) criteria and guidelines for food allergen
138138 awareness training and certification programs as required by
139139 Section 437.026, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
140140 SECTION 4. (a) Notwithstanding Section 437.024, Health and
141141 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a food service establishment is
142142 not required to comply with that section until September 1, 2016.
143143 (b) Notwithstanding Section 437.026, Health and Safety
144144 Code, as added by this Act, a food handler, food server, or manager
145145 employed at a food service establishment on or before February 1,
146146 2016, must comply with that section on or before March 1, 2016.
147147 SECTION 5. Not earlier than September 1, 2016, and not later
148148 than September 1, 2017, the executive commissioner of the Health
149149 and Human Services Commission shall, in consultation with Food
150150 Allergy Research & Education and the Texas Restaurant Association,
151151 submit a report to the legislature analyzing the impact of this Act
152152 on food service establishments and consumers. The report must
153153 include the rate at which food service establishments comply with
154154 the requirements of this Act and recommendations to improve food
155155 allergen awareness by food service establishments and their
156156 employees that are consistent with the public health and welfare.
157157 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.