Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2058 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/16/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R18054 LED-F
 By: Lucio S.B. No. 2058


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to food allergen awareness in food service establishments;
 authorizing a fee; requiring a food allergen awareness
 certification for certain food service employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivisions (5-a), (5-b), and (5-c) to read as
 follows:
 (5-a) "Major food allergen":
 (A)  includes:
 (i)  milk;
 (ii)  eggs;
 (iii)  fish, including bass, flounder, and
 cod;
 (iv)  crustaceans, including crab, lobster,
 and shrimp;
 (v)  tree nuts, including almonds, pecans,
 and walnuts;
 (vi)  wheat;
 (vii)  peanuts;
 (viii)  soybeans; and
 (ix)  a food ingredient that contains
 protein derived from any of those foods; and
 (B)  does not include any food ingredient that is
 exempt from the food allergen labeling requirements of Section
 403(w), Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (21 U.S.C. Section
 343).
 (5-b) "Menu" means a printed or pictorial display of
 food items and prices of those items that are available for sale
 from a food service establishment. The term includes a display of
 food items that is distributed outside the food service
 establishment, a promotional display of food items from which a
 customer may place an order, and a display of food items on the food
 service establishment's Internet website.
 (5-c) "Menu board" means a list or pictorial display of
 food items and the prices of those food items posted within or
 outside a food service establishment.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 437, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Sections 437.024, 437.025, and 437.026 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 437.024.  FOOD ALLERGEN NOTICE ON MENUS AND MENU
 BOARDS. (a) A food service establishment shall include on each menu
 and menu board a clear and conspicuous notice requesting that a
 customer notify the server of the customer's allergy to a major food
 allergen before placing an order. The notice shall state: "Before
 placing your order, please inform your server if a person in your
 party has a food allergy."
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), a food service
 establishment shall ensure that notice described by Subsection (a)
 posted on a menu board is easily readable from the point of service
 at which a customer orders food. The font size of the notice must be
 the same size as or larger than the smallest font size of a menu item
 listed on the menu board.
 (c)  A food service establishment may, instead of posting the
 notice described by Subsection (a) on the menu board, post the
 notice adjacent to the menu board. The notice posted under this
 subsection must be:
 (1)  securely posted and easily readable from a
 distance of five feet by a customer standing at or approaching the
 point of service;
 (2)  directly facing the customer; and
 (3)  unobstructed from a customer's view.
 Sec. 437.025.  FOOD ALLERGY AWARE DESIGNATION. (a) The
 department shall develop a program to designate certain food
 service establishments as food allergy aware. The department shall
 maintain a list of food service establishments that receive the
 designation on the department's Internet website.
 (b)  Participation by a food service establishment in the
 food allergy aware program is voluntary.
 (c)  The executive commissioner shall adopt guidelines and
 requirements for a food service establishment to receive the food
 allergy aware designation. The requirements must include
 maintaining on the premises and making available to the public a
 master list of all ingredients used in the preparation of each food
 item available for consumption.
 Sec. 437.026.  REQUIRED FOOD ALLERGEN AWARENESS TRAINING AND
 CERTIFICATION.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Food allergen awareness training and
 certification program" means a program approved by the department
 under this section.
 (2)  "Food handler" means a food service employee who
 works with unpackaged food, food equipment or utensils, or
 food-contact surfaces.
 (3)  "Food server" includes any food service employee
 who takes food orders from customers or delivers food to customers.
 (b)  Each food handler, food server, and manager employed at
 a food service establishment shall successfully complete a food
 allergen awareness training and certification program approved by
 the department as required by this sections not later than the 30th
 day after the date on which the person is hired by the food service
 establishment.
 (c)  Each food handler, food server, and manager who
 completes the food allergen awareness training and certification
 program must renew the certification every three years while that
 person is employed at the food service establishment.
 (d)  Each manager shall post for display the manager's
 certification required by Subsection (b).
 (e)  A manager shall ensure that at least one person with the
 certification required by Subsection (b) is present at the food
 service establishment during all hours the establishment provides
 food service to customers.
 (f)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish
 criteria and guidelines for food allergen awareness training and
 certification programs. The department may approve food allergen
 awareness training and certification programs that meet the
 established criteria and guidelines. A food allergen awareness
 training and certification program approved by the department must
 include training on:
 (1)  the serious nature of food allergy;
 (2)  the importance of reading ingredient labels and of
 strict allergen avoidance;
 (3)  the avoidance of cross-contact during food
 preparation; and
 (4)  the means of activating emergency assistance in
 the event of an allergic reaction.
 (g)  The executive commissioner by rule shall establish a fee
 for the department to charge in the amount necessary to cover the
 costs of administering this section to each person that applies for
 the department's approval of a food allergen awareness training and
 certification program.
 (h)  The department at least every five years shall review
 each food allergen awareness training and certification program
 approved by the department to ensure the program continues to meet
 the criteria and guidelines established by rule under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall, in
 consultation with Food Allergy Research & Education and the Texas
 Restaurant Association, adopt rules establishing:
 (1)  the guidelines and requirements for a food allergy
 aware designation as required by Section 437.025, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act; and
 (2)  criteria and guidelines for food allergen
 awareness training and certification programs as required by
 Section 437.026, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  (a) Notwithstanding Section 437.024, Health and
 Safety Code, as added by this Act, a food service establishment is
 not required to comply with that section until September 1, 2016.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 437.026, Health and Safety
 Code, as added by this Act, a food handler, food server, or manager
 employed at a food service establishment on or before February 1,
 2016, must comply with that section on or before March 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  Not earlier than September 1, 2016, and not later
 than September 1, 2017, the executive commissioner of the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall, in consultation with Food
 Allergy Research & Education and the Texas Restaurant Association,
 submit a report to the legislature analyzing the impact of this Act
 on food service establishments and consumers. The report must
 include the rate at which food service establishments comply with
 the requirements of this Act and recommendations to improve food
 allergen awareness by food service establishments and their
 employees that are consistent with the public health and welfare.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.