Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1583 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1432 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |