House | 05/12/2015 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 05/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1303 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1239 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1174 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Creighton | Journal Page: 1173 |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1173 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1093 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 207 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 145 | |
Senate | 12/05/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/05/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |