1 | | - | By: Creighton, Nichols S.B. No. 228 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed December 5, 2014; January 28, 2015, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Finance; |
---|
4 | | - | April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | | - | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 12, Nays 1; April 23, 2015, |
---|
6 | | - | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | | - | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 228 By: Kolkhorst |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Creighton, Campbell S.B. No. 228 |
---|
| 2 | + | Nichols |
---|
9 | 3 | | |
---|
10 | 4 | | |
---|
11 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 7 | | relating to an exemption from the sales tax for firearms and hunting |
---|
14 | 8 | | supplies for a limited period. |
---|
15 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended |
---|
17 | 11 | | by adding Section 151.358 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 12 | | Sec. 151.358. FIREARMS AND HUNTING SUPPLIES FOR LIMITED |
---|
19 | 13 | | PERIOD. (a) In this section, "hunting supplies" means ammunition, |
---|
20 | 14 | | archery equipment, hunting blinds and stands, hunting decoys, |
---|
21 | 15 | | firearm cleaning supplies, gun cases and gun safes, hunting optics, |
---|
22 | 16 | | and hunting safety equipment. |
---|
23 | 17 | | (b) The sale of a firearm or hunting supplies is exempted |
---|
24 | 18 | | from the taxes imposed by this chapter if the sale takes place |
---|
32 | | - | SECTION 2. (a) Notwithstanding Section 151.358(b)(1), Tax |
---|
33 | | - | Code, as added by this Act, if this Act takes effect September 1, |
---|
34 | | - | 2015, the exemption provided by that subdivision from the taxes |
---|
35 | | - | imposed by Chapter 151, Tax Code, applies to a sale that takes place |
---|
36 | | - | during a period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Friday before the |
---|
37 | | - | first full weekend in September 2015 and ending at 12 midnight on |
---|
38 | | - | the following Sunday if the sale otherwise meets the requirements |
---|
39 | | - | of that section. |
---|
| 22 | + | SECTION 2. (a) Notwithstanding Section 151.358, Tax Code, |
---|
| 23 | + | as added by this Act, if this Act takes effect September 1, 2015, |
---|
| 24 | + | the exemption provided by that section from the taxes imposed by |
---|
| 25 | + | Chapter 151, Tax Code, applies to a sale that takes place during a |
---|
| 26 | + | period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Friday before the first full |
---|
| 27 | + | weekend in September 2015 and ending at 12 midnight on the following |
---|
| 28 | + | Sunday if the sale otherwise meets the requirements of that |
---|
| 29 | + | section. |
---|
40 | 30 | | (b) If this Act receives the vote necessary for immediate |
---|
41 | 31 | | effect as provided by Section 4 of this Act, this section has no |
---|
42 | 32 | | effect. |
---|
43 | 33 | | (c) If this section takes effect, this section expires |
---|
44 | 34 | | October 1, 2015. |
---|
45 | 35 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act does not |
---|
46 | 36 | | affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this |
---|
47 | 37 | | Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been |
---|
48 | 38 | | enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the |
---|
49 | 39 | | collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of |
---|
50 | 40 | | the liability for those taxes. |
---|
51 | 41 | | SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
52 | 42 | | Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of |
---|
53 | 43 | | all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, |
---|
54 | 44 | | Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the |
---|
55 | 45 | | vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect |
---|
56 | 46 | | September 1, 2015. |
---|