House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4343
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3543
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3108
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1452
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1452
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1392
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
01/28/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 146
|
Senate
|
12/09/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/09/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|